Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Certifying Providers
Sponsored by
Delegates Glenn, Pendergrass, Pena-Melnyk, Bagnall, Barron, Carr, Cullison, Hill, Johnson, Kelly, Kerr, Kipke, Krebs, R. Lewis, Metzgar, Rosenberg, Sample-Hughes, Szeliga, and K. Young
Status
In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "certifying provider" to include physician assistants who have an active unrestricted license to practice, have an active delegation agreement with a physician who is a certifying provider, and are in good standing with the State Board of Physicians; and altering the membership of the Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
11/20/2018
Legislative Date
11/20/2018
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Certifying Providers
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2019
Legislative Date
1/22/2019
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2019
Legislative Date
2/12/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2019
Legislative Date
2/13/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {276480/1 Adopted
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2019
Legislative Date
2/13/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
26
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Certifying Providers
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2019
Legislative Date
2/15/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (122-14)
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
4/05/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {408176/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 11/20/2018 11/20/2018 Pre-filed
House 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Certifying Providers
House 1/22/2019 1/22/2019 Hearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 Favorable with Amendments {276480/1 Adopted 26
House 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 26
Text - Third - Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Certifying Providers
House 2/15/2019 2/15/2019 Third Reading Passed (122-14) 28
Senate 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 Referred Judicial Proceedings 28
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Hearing 3/21 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Favorable with Amendments {408176/1 Adopted 62
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 63
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-3301, 13-3303 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM