Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Required Number of School Days or Hours
Sponsored by
Delegate Adams
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the requirement that certain public schools be open for at least 180 days and a minimum of 1,080 hours during a 10-month period in each school year to require that the schools be open for at least 180 days or a minimum of 1,080 hours during a 10-month period in each school year; and providing that certain funding for schools may not be reduced if there are fewer than 1,080 school hours under certain circumstances.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1043 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/18/2019
Legislative Date
9/18/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Education - Required Number of School Days or Hours
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2020
Legislative Date
1/13/2020
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:15 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/18/2019 9/18/2019 Pre-filed
House 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Education - Required Number of School Days or Hours
House 1/13/2020 1/13/2020 Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing canceled
House 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing 1/28 at 1:15 p.m.
House 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/30/2020 2:57 PM