Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Nonviolent Convictions
Sponsored by
Delegate Glenn
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a person to file a petition for expungement if the person was convicted of a nonviolent crime; authorizing a court to determine whether a person who has filed a petition under the Act is entitled to expungement; requiring the court to take the specific circumstances of the case and the petitioner into consideration when making an expungement determination; and making certain technical corrections.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
11/20/2018
Legislative Date
11/20/2018
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Nonviolent Convictions
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2019
Legislative Date
1/10/2019
Action
Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 11/20/2018 11/20/2018 Pre-filed
House 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Nonviolent Convictions
House 1/10/2019 1/10/2019 Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM