Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Occupational Licenses or Certificates - Application Determinations - Use of Criminal History
Sponsored by
Delegate Sydnor
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 568
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Attorney General's Review Letter
Synopsis
Prohibiting certain departments that issue occupational licenses or certificates from denying an application for a license or certificate based solely on an applicant's criminal history if a period of 7 years or more has passed since the applicant's conviction for any crime and the applicant has not been charged with another crime other than a minor traffic violation; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
11/19/2018
Legislative Date
11/19/2018
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2019
Legislative Date
1/16/2019
Action
Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {553890/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (99-39)
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2019
Legislative Date
5/25/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 568
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 11/19/2018 11/19/2018 Pre-filed
House 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Occupational Licenses or Certificates - Application Determinations - Use of Criminal History
House 1/16/2019 1/16/2019 Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Favorable with Amendments {553890/1 Adopted 47
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Text - Third - Occupational Licenses or Certificates - Application Determinations - Use of Criminal History
House 3/18/2019 3/13/2019 Third Reading Passed (99-39) 48A
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Judicial Proceedings 47A
Senate 3/21/2019 3/21/2019 Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Favorable Adopted 63
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Second Reading Passed 63
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 64
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 568
Text - Chapter - Occupational Licenses or Certificates - Application Determinations - Use of Criminal History
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM