Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Action to Collect a Private Education Loan - Required Documents
Sponsored by
Delegate Lopez
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m. (Appropriations)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting private education lenders and private education loan collectors from initiating a certain action except under certain circumstances; prohibiting a court from entering a certain judgment unless the private education lender or private education loan collector introduces certain documents; providing that the failure of a private education lender or private education loan collector to provide certain information at a certain time constitutes an unfair, abusive, or deceptive trade practice; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/29/2020
Legislative Date
10/29/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Appropriations and Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Action to Collect a Private Education Loan - Required Documents
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/04/2021
Legislative Date
1/04/2021
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m. (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/29/2020 10/29/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Appropriations and Judiciary
Text - First - Action to Collect a Private Education Loan - Required Documents
House 1/04/2021 1/04/2021 Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m. (Appropriations)
(   5-1301 through 5-1304 )
Last Updated: 1/29/2021 12:40 PM
Click to return on the top page