Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Condominiums – Disclosures to Unit Owners and Prohibited Provisions in Instruments
Sponsored by
Delegates C. Watson, Qi, Guyton, Bagnall, Pena-Melnyk, Terrasa, Feldmark, Hartman, Palakovich Carr, Hettleman, and Crutchfield
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Clarifying that certain provisions of law relating to closed-door meetings of a board of directors of a condominium do not allow the board to withhold or agree to withhold from the unit owners the terms of any legal agreement to which the council of unit owners is a party; establishing that a provision in a certain agreement that prohibits a the disclosure to certain unit owners or purchasers of any term of the agreement is unenforceable; and applying the Act prospectively.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0471
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/03/2019
Legislative Date
9/03/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {340610/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
45
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/03/2019 9/03/2019 Pre-filed
House 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Condominiums - Disclosures to Unit Owners and Prohibited Provisions in Instruments by Developers (Sunset Island Act)
House 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/06/2020 3/06/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/09/2020 3/06/2020 Favorable with Amendments {340610/1 Adopted 43A
House 3/09/2020 3/06/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43A
Text - Third - Condominiums – Disclosures to Unit Owners and Prohibited Provisions in Instruments
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 44
Senate 3/11/2020 3/06/2020 Referred Judicial Proceedings 45
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/15/2020 12:01 PM