Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plates and Fund - Hunger Relief Initiatives
Sponsored by
Delegate Queen
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration to develop and make available for certain vehicles a special registration plate supporting hunger relief initiatives; authorizing certain persons to apply to the Administration for the special registration plate for certain classes of vehicles; requiring the owner of a vehicle assigned a special registration plate to pay certain fees; establishing the Hunger Relief Initiatives Fund; requiring that certain fees collected under the Act be used only for funding hunger relief initiatives; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
7/08/2019
Legislative Date
7/08/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/09/2020
Legislative Date
1/09/2020
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 7/08/2019 7/08/2019 Pre-filed
House 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plates and Fund - Hunger Relief Initiatives
House 1/09/2020 1/09/2020 Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
House 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-619.4 )
Last Updated: 2/14/2020 1:59 PM