Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Amusement Devices - Free-Play Pinball Machines - Use by Minors
Sponsored by
Delegate Luedtke
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Eliminating a requirement that prohibits a person who keeps a specified free-play pinball machine from allowing a minor to operate the machine.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/21/2016
Legislative Date
4/21/2016
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Amusement Devices - Free-Play Pinball Machines - Use by Minors
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2017
Legislative Date
1/31/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
15
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Amusement Devices - Free-Play Pinball Machines - Use by Minors
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2017
Legislative Date
2/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
17
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
17
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 4/21/2016 4/21/2016 Pre-filed
House 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Amusement Devices - Free-Play Pinball Machines - Use by Minors
House 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 1/31/2017 1/31/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 15
Text - Third - Amusement Devices - Free-Play Pinball Machines - Use by Minors
House 2/02/2017 2/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 17
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 Referred Budget and Taxation 17
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM