Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Plug-In Electric Drive Vehicles - Reserved Parking Spaces
Sponsored by
Delegates Lam, Gaines, Krimm, K. Young, Hill, Lafferty, Turner, Fraser-Hidalgo, Tarlau, Ebersole, Robinson, Luedtke, and Ciliberti
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from stopping, standing, or parking a vehicle that is not a plug-in electric drive vehicle in a parking space that is designated for the use of plug-in electric drive vehicles; requiring that a parking space for the use of plug-in electric drive vehicles have green pavement markings; requiring that a parking space for the use of plug-in electric drive vehicles be counted as part of the overall number of parking spaces for specified purposes; applying a civil penalty of $100 for a violation of the Act; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0302
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0839 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/15/2016
Legislative Date
9/15/2016
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/15/2016 9/15/2016 Pre-filed
House 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Plug-In Electric Drive Vehicles - Reserved Parking Spaces
House 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 Hearing 1/26 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-145.1, 21-1003.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM