Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - References to Absentee Voting in Communications - Mail-In Voting
Sponsored by
Delegate Palakovich Carr
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Board of Elections and each local board of elections to refer to absentee ballots as "mail-in" ballots and absentee voting as "mail-in voting" in all communications with voters and the general public; and requiring the State Board and each local board to include in public communications regarding "mail-in voting" a statement that "mail-in voting" is referred to as absentee voting in the Maryland Constitution, the Annotated Code of Maryland and the Code of Maryland Regulations.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0145
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/20/2019
Legislative Date
9/20/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/07/2020
Legislative Date
1/07/2020
Action
Hearing 1/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {375867/1 Adopted
Proceedings
17
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
17
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (99-37)
Proceedings
18
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
19
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/20/2019 9/20/2019 Pre-filed
House 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Election Law - References to Absentee Voting in Communications - Mail-In Voting
House 1/07/2020 1/07/2020 Hearing 1/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 Favorable with Amendments {375867/1 Adopted 17
House 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 17
Text - Third - Election Law - References to Absentee Voting in Communications - Mail-In Voting
House 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 Third Reading Passed (99-37) 18
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 19
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/14/2020 12:10 PM