Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government – Department of Information Technology – Cybersecurity
Sponsored by
Delegate Carey
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Secretary of Information Technology, in consultation with the Attorney General, to advise and oversee a consistent cybersecurity strategy for units of State government, including institutions under the control of the governing boards of public institutions of higher education; requiring the Secretary, in consultation with the Attorney General, to develop guidance on consistent cybersecurity strategies for counties, municipal corporations, certain other entities and political subdivisions; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0049
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0120 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/19/2020
Legislative Date
10/19/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 1/14 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/07/2021
Legislative Date
1/07/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/07/2021
Legislative Date
1/07/2021
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/19/2020 10/19/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 1/14 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - State Government – Department of Information Technology – Cybersecurity
House 1/07/2021 1/07/2021 Hearing canceled
House 1/07/2021 1/07/2021 Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/19/2021 4:34 PM