Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Action for Change of Name - Waiver of Publication Requirement
Sponsored by
Delegate Shetty
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a court to waive a certain publication requirement in an action for change of name under the Maryland Rules on motion by an individual who has filed the action.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0581
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/23/2020
Legislative Date
9/23/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 1/15 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Action for Change of Name - Waiver of Publication Requirement
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2021
Legislative Date
2/04/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
9 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Action for Change of Name - Waiver of Publication Requirement
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-4)
Proceedings
10 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
11 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/23/2020 9/23/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judiciary
House 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 1/15 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Action for Change of Name - Waiver of Publication Requirement
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/04/2021 2/04/2021 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 9 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Action for Change of Name - Waiver of Publication Requirement
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Third Reading Passed (131-4) 10 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/12/2021 2/10/2021 Referred Judicial Proceedings 11 Click to view Recorded Media
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/22/2021 12:55 PM
Click to return on the top page