Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Evidence - Causing Unavailability of Witness
Sponsored by
Delegates Barron and Henson
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering certain provisions relating to the admission in evidence, during certain criminal trials, of a statement offered against a party who wrongfully caused or acquiesced in wrongfully causing the unavailability of the declarant of the statement; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0064
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
11/01/2019
Legislative Date
11/01/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Evidence - Causing Unavailability of Witness
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/09/2020
Legislative Date
1/09/2020
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2020
Legislative Date
1/15/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2020
Legislative Date
1/15/2020
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 11/01/2019 11/01/2019 Pre-filed
House 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Evidence - Causing Unavailability of Witness
House 1/09/2020 1/09/2020 Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/15/2020 1/15/2020 Hearing canceled
House 1/15/2020 1/15/2020 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/19/2020 3:50 PM