Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Use of Handheld Telephone While Driving - Penalty
Sponsored by
Delegate Turner
Status
In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing for a maximum fine of $500 for a violation of certain prohibitions against using a handheld telephone while driving a motor vehicle; etc.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0242 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/27/2017
Legislative Date
9/27/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Use of Handheld Telephone While Driving - Penalty
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2018
Legislative Date
1/12/2018
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws - Use of Handheld Telephone While Driving - Penalty
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (77-59)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {738772/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Hershey) Rejected (17-27)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {393720/1 (Senator Kagan)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Motion Lay Over for 1 Hour (Senator Kagan) Adopted (23-10)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {393720/1 (Senator Kagan) Withdrawn
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {403328/1 (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Third Readings Passed with Amendments (32-12)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Beidle, McCray and Anderton)
Proceedings
66
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/27/2017 9/27/2017 Pre-filed
House 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Use of Handheld Telephone While Driving - Penalty
House 1/12/2018 1/12/2018 Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 40
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws - Use of Handheld Telephone While Driving - Penalty
House 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Third Reading Passed (77-59) 42
Senate 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 Referred Judicial Proceedings 43
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Favorable with Amendments {738772/1 Adopted 62A
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62A
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Hershey) Rejected (17-27) 63
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Floor Amendment {393720/1 (Senator Kagan) 63
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Motion Lay Over for 1 Hour (Senator Kagan) Adopted (23-10) 63
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Floor Amendment {393720/1 (Senator Kagan) Withdrawn 63
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Floor Amendment {403328/1 (Senator Hershey) Adopted 63
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Third Readings Passed with Amendments (32-12) 63
House 4/09/2018 4/01/2018 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 66
House 4/09/2018 4/01/2018 House Requests Senate Recede 66
House 4/09/2018 4/01/2018 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Beidle, McCray and Anderton) 66
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-1124.2, 27-101 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM