Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Information Technology - Office of Broadband and Joint Committee on Broadband
Sponsored by
Delegate Krimm
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the uses of the Rural Broadband Assistance Fund; establishing the Office of Broadband in the Department of Information Technology to assist local jurisdictions in improving access to high-speed internet; requiring the Office to coordinate with certain Executive Branch agencies and stakeholders; establishing the Joint Committee on Broadband to ensure that local jurisdictions in the State are able to expand access to high-speed internet and make recommendations for new laws, programs, and services needed to support the expansion; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/30/2020
Legislative Date
10/30/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2021
Legislative Date
1/12/2021
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/30/2020 10/30/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Department of Information Technology - Office of Broadband and Joint Committee on Broadband
House 1/12/2021 1/12/2021 Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 2/9/2021 9:17 AM
Click to return on the top page