Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commission to Advance Next Generation 9-1-1 Across Maryland - Extension and Alteration
Sponsored by
Delegates Krebs and M. Jackson (By Request - Commission to Advance Next Generation 9-1-1 Across Maryland)
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Commission to Advance Next Generation 9-1-1 Across Maryland to report certain findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 15, 2020, and on or before December 15, 2021; and extending the termination date for the Commission by 2 years to June 30, 2022.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0047
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
8/28/2019
Legislative Date
8/28/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/14/2020
Legislative Date
1/14/2020
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2020
Legislative Date
2/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2020
Legislative Date
2/14/2020
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
28
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 8/28/2019 8/28/2019 Pre-filed
House 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Commission to Advance Next Generation 9-1-1 Across Maryland - Extension and Alteration
House 1/14/2020 1/14/2020 Hearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 25
Text - Third - Commission to Advance Next Generation 9-1-1 Across Maryland - Extension and Alteration
House 2/13/2020 2/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 27
Senate 2/14/2020 2/14/2020 Referred Finance 28
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:32 PM