Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Economic Development - Opportunity Zone Incentives - Alteration of the More Jobs for Marylanders and Opportunity Zone Enhancement Programs
Sponsored by
Delegate Palakovich Carr
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/28 at 1:15 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering certain terms relating to eligibility for benefits under the More Jobs for Marylanders and Opportunity Zone Enhancement programs; altering, to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2018, but before January 1, 2022, the time for which enhancements under the Opportunity Zone Enhancement Program are applicable; limiting eligibility for certain Opportunity Zone Enhancement Program benefits to investments in biotechnology and cybersecurity companies established in opportunity zones on or after March 1, 2018; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0122
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
7/01/2019
Legislative Date
7/01/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/14/2020
Legislative Date
1/14/2020
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:15 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 7/01/2019 7/01/2019 Pre-filed
House 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Economic Development - Opportunity Zone Incentives - Alteration of the More Jobs for Marylanders and Opportunity Zone Enhancement Programs
House 1/14/2020 1/14/2020 Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing canceled
House 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing 1/28 at 1:15 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/28/2020 4:18 PM