Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure – Registered Sex Offenders – Entry Onto School Property
Sponsored by
Delegates Bhandari and C. Jackson
Status
In the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing a certain exception authorizing, under certain circumstances, a student who is a registered sex offender to enter onto real property used for public or nonpublic elementary or secondary education; requiring a student who is a registered sex offender to continue receiving an education in accordance with State law in a locale other than real property used for public or nonpublic education; requiring a county board of education and the State Board of Education to develop certain guidelines and policies; etc.
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0515
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/02/2020
Legislative Date
9/02/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2021
Legislative Date
1/15/2021
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2021
Legislative Date
2/25/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/02/2020 9/02/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Criminal Procedure – Registered Sex Offenders – Entry Onto School Property
House 1/15/2021 1/15/2021 Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/25/2021 2/25/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/24/2021 9:19 PM
Click to return on the top page