Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property - Alterations in Actions for Repossession and Establishment of Eviction Diversion Program
Sponsored by
Delegate Wells
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m. (Judiciary)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Eviction Diversion Program in the District Court to reduce the incidence of judgments for repossession of residential property and to promote continuity of housing; requiring the Chief Judge of the District Court to establish a Program in a District Court sitting in a county that processed 10,000 or more claims for repossession of residential property in fiscal year 2019; requiring that a landlord provide a certain written statement to a tenant within 5 days of receiving a certain request from the tenant; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0454
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/30/2020
Legislative Date
10/30/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary and Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m. (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/30/2020 10/30/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judiciary and Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Real Property - Alterations in Actions for Repossession and Establishment of Eviction Diversion Program
House 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m. (Judiciary)
(   4-501 through 4-503 )
Last Updated: 2/22/2021 8:21 AM
Click to return on the top page