Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Firearm Safety Devices
Sponsored by
Delegates Parrott, Buckel, Rey, Shoemaker, Reilly, Impallaria, Ciliberti, and Folden
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/18 at 11:00 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing an exemption under the sales and use tax for the sale of specified firearm safety devices, including a firearm safe, firearm lockbox, trigger and barrel lock, or any other item designed to enhance home firearm safety; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1271 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/28/2016
Legislative Date
9/28/2016
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Firearm Safety Devices
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/04/2017
Legislative Date
1/04/2017
Action
Hearing 1/18 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/28/2016 9/28/2016 Pre-filed
House 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Firearm Safety Devices
House 1/04/2017 1/04/2017 Hearing 1/18 at 11:00 a.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-233 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM