Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Voters' Rights Protection Act of 2020
Sponsored by
Delegate Rosenberg
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a local board of elections from making a covered change in voting locations except under certain circumstances; requiring a local board to attempt to contact a voter who failed to sign a paper absentee ballot application and attempt to obtain the voter's signature for a certain purpose; prohibiting a person from using a camera, a cellular telephone, or another device capable of recording video to record voters as they approach or deposit ballots in a ballot drop box except under certain circumstances; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
7/15/2020
Legislative Date
7/15/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Voters' Rights Protection Act of 2020
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 7/15/2020 7/15/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Voters' Rights Protection Act of 2020
(   11-302,   13-405.3, 2-304, 8-103,   9-305,   9-310.1 )
Last Updated: 1/29/2021 12:40 PM
Click to return on the top page