Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Small Business, Entrepreneurship, and Innovation - Established
Sponsored by
Delegate J. Lewis
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Department of Small Business, Entrepreneurship, and Innovation to assist units of State government in identifying and evaluating qualified minority business enterprises to help achieve the objective for greater use of minority business enterprises; establishing the Department in the Executive Branch; transferring authority over from the Maryland Small Business Development Financing Authority; transferring the responsibilities of the Governor's Office of Small, Minority, and Women Business affairs to the Department; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0722
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/14/2020
Legislative Date
9/14/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/14/2020 9/14/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Department of Small Business, Entrepreneurship, and Innovation - Established
Last Updated: 2/5/2021 7:53 AM
Click to return on the top page