Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Lead and Mercury Wheel Weights - Prohibited
Sponsored by
Delegate Lam
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 385
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting specified persons from using, allowing to be used, or selling specified lead wheel weights after January 1, 2020; requiring the State to ensure that no vehicle purchased for the State fleet after January 1, 2019, is equipped with an externally attached lead wheel weight that is composed of greater than 0.1% lead or 0.1% mercury by weight; prohibiting a tire on a vehicle in the State fleet that is balanced or replaced after January 1, 2018, from being equipped with specified lead wheel weights; etc.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1328 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/16/2016
Legislative Date
9/16/2016
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Environment - Lead and Mercury Wheel Weights - Prohibited
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2017
Legislative Date
2/27/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
2/28/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Environment - Lead and Mercury Wheel Weights - Prohibited
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2017
Legislative Date
3/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (88-47)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/03/2017
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
36
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {164633/1
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 4/5 (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {164633/1 Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {493922/1 (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-14)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (99-39)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Environment - Lead and Mercury Wheel Weights - Prohibited
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 385
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Environment - Lead and Mercury Wheel Weights - Prohibited
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/16/2016 9/16/2016 Pre-filed
House 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Environment - Lead and Mercury Wheel Weights - Prohibited
House 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 2/27/2017 2/27/2017 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 2/28/2017 2/28/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 35
Text - Third - Environment - Lead and Mercury Wheel Weights - Prohibited
House 3/02/2017 3/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (88-47) 37
Senate 3/03/2017 3/03/2017 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 36
Senate 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/03/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 Favorable with Amendments {164633/1 58
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 Motion Special Order until 4/5 (Senator Jennings) Adopted 58
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable with Amendments {164633/1 Adopted 60
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Floor Amendment {493922/1 (Senator Jennings) Adopted 60
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (32-14) 61
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 House Concurs Senate Amendments 66
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (99-39) 66
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Environment - Lead and Mercury Wheel Weights - Prohibited
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 385
Text - Chapter - Environment - Lead and Mercury Wheel Weights - Prohibited
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-501 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM