Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City and Prince George's County - Diversionary and Reentry Program
Sponsored by
Delegate T. Branch
Status
In the House - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Office of the State's Attorney for Baltimore City to establish a Diversionary and Reentry Program in Baltimore City for at-risk youth and youth offenders; requiring the Office of the State's Attorney for Prince George's County to establish a Diversionary and Reentry Program in Prince George's County for at-risk youth and youth offenders; establishing that the purposes of the programs are to improve public safety, develop skills for at-risk youth, and reduce recidivism by youth offenders; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0115
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/27/2020
Legislative Date
10/27/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2021
Legislative Date
1/15/2021
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2021
Legislative Date
2/25/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/27/2020 10/27/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Baltimore City and Prince George's County - Diversionary and Reentry Program
House 1/15/2021 1/15/2021 Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m.
House 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 Hearing canceled
House 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Hearing 2/25 at 1:30 p.m.
House 2/25/2021 2/25/2021 Hearing canceled
Last Updated: 2/25/2021 12:06 PM
Click to return on the top page