Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Intersections - Prohibited Acts
Sponsored by
Delegates Carr, Korman, and Love
Status
In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a vehicle facing a circular green signal, a green arrow signal, or a steady yellow signal from entering an intersection if the vehicle is unable to completely proceed through the intersection; establishing certain exceptions to the prohibition; prohibiting a police officer from issuing a citation for a violation of the Act unless the approach to the intersection has certain signage installed notifying the public that a vehicle may not make a movement at the intersection that violates the Act's provisions; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0108 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/09/2020
Legislative Date
1/09/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Intersections - Prohibited Acts
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2020
Legislative Date
1/13/2020
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {270712/1 Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws - Intersections - Prohibited Acts
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2020
Legislative Date
2/20/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (116-23)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2020
Legislative Date
2/21/2020
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/09/2020 1/09/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Intersections - Prohibited Acts
House 1/13/2020 1/13/2020 Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Favorable with Amendments {270712/1 Adopted 30
House 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws - Intersections - Prohibited Acts
House 2/20/2020 2/20/2020 Third Reading Passed (116-23) 32
Senate 2/21/2020 2/21/2020 Referred Judicial Proceedings 33
Senate 3/09/2020 3/09/2020 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing canceled
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-202 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:33 PM