Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Homeowner's Insurance - Underwriting Based on Geographic Area
Sponsored by
Delegate O'Donnell
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the requirements an insurer must meet before refusing to issue or renew a policy of homeowner's insurance solely because the insured property or the applicant's or insured's address is located within a specified geographic area of the State; requiring an insurer to adopt a specified underwriting standard and file it with the Maryland Insurance Commissioner for approval; specifying exceptions; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1383 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2013
Legislative Date
1/11/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2013
Legislative Date
1/16/2013
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/27/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/27/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/01/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-3)
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/04/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/11/2013 1/11/2013 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/16/2013 1/16/2013 Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/25/2013 2/26/2013 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 2/27/2013 2/27/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 36
House 2/27/2013 2/27/2013 Second Reading Passed 36
House 3/01/2013 3/01/2013 Third Reading Passed (132-3) 38
Senate 3/04/2013 3/04/2013 First Reading Finance 37
Senate 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   19-107, 19-215 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM