Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Transportation Authority - Video Streaming and Archiving - Open Meetings
Sponsored by
Delegates Carr, Korman, Love, Bagnall, Barron, Bhandari, Charles, Chisholm, Hill, Johnson, Kelly, Kerr, Kipke, Krebs, R. Lewis, Morgan, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Reilly, Rosenberg, Saab, Sample-Hughes, Szeliga, and K. Young
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Transportation Authority to make available to the public on the Internet live video streaming of each open meeting of the Authority held at the Authority's headquarters or any other location where the Authority held at least 10 meetings in the preceding calendar year; requiring the Authority to make available to the public on the Internet complete and unedited archived video recordings of streamed open meetings; requiring the Authority to make the archived video recordings available for a minimum of 5 years; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0123
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0021 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/09/2020
Legislative Date
1/09/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/14/2020
Legislative Date
1/14/2020
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {266482/1 Adopted
Proceedings
20
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
20
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-0)
Proceedings
21
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
22
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/09/2020 1/09/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Maryland Transportation Authority - Video Streaming and Archiving - Open Meetings
House 1/14/2020 1/14/2020 Hearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Favorable with Amendments {266482/1 Adopted 20
House 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 20
Text - Third - Maryland Transportation Authority - Video Streaming and Archiving - Open Meetings
House 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Third Reading Passed (129-0) 21
Senate 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 22
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:33 PM