Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Career Exploration and Development Activities - Coffee (Java Act)
Sponsored by
Baltimore County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 367
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing an Executive Branch agency to ban or regulate the sale of coffee in conjunction with a career exploration and development activity in a public high school in Baltimore County; providing a certain exception for a career exploration and development activity in a public high school that sold coffee on or before June 30, 2018; and repealing a certain termination provision.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0183 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2018
Legislative Date
1/11/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2018
Legislative Date
1/18/2018
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {745662/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-3)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48B
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 367
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/11/2018 1/11/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Education - Career Exploration and Development Activities - Coffee (Java Act)
House 1/18/2018 1/18/2018 Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable with Amendments {745662/1 Adopted 47A
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47A
Text - Third - Education - Career Exploration and Development Activities - Coffee (Java Act)
House 3/19/2018 3/14/2018 Third Reading Passed (130-3) 48
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48B
Senate 3/22/2018 3/22/2018 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/04/2018 4/04/2018 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Favorable Adopted 62
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Second Reading Passed 62
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 63
House 4/06/2018 3/29/2018 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 367
Text - Chapter - Education - Career Exploration and Development Activities - Coffee (Java Act)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-423.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM