Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Decriminalization of Attempted Suicide
Sponsored by
Delegates Moon, Acevero, Atterbeary, Barron, Charkoudian, Hettleman, Korman, Lierman, Luedtke, Stewart, Sydnor, and Wilkins
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 571
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that attempted suicide is not a crime in the State; providing that the Act may not be construed to prohibit a person who commits one or more crimes in the course of attempting to commit suicide from being charged with the other crime or crimes; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0395
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2019
Legislative Date
1/17/2019
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2019
Legislative Date
1/17/2019
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Law - Decriminalization of Attempted Suicide
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2019
Legislative Date
1/17/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2019
Legislative Date
1/17/2019
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2019
Legislative Date
2/20/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {222411/1 Adopted
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2019
Legislative Date
2/20/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Criminal Law - Decriminalization of Attempted Suicide
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (103-38)
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {528971/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (104-34)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Criminal Law - Decriminalization of Attempted Suicide
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2019
Legislative Date
5/25/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 571
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Criminal Law - Decriminalization of Attempted Suicide
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/17/2019 1/17/2019 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/17/2019 1/17/2019 Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Criminal Law - Decriminalization of Attempted Suicide
House 1/17/2019 1/17/2019 Hearing canceled
House 1/17/2019 1/17/2019 Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 2/20/2019 2/20/2019 Favorable with Amendments {222411/1 Adopted 31
House 2/20/2019 2/20/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 31
Text - Third - Criminal Law - Decriminalization of Attempted Suicide
House 2/22/2019 2/22/2019 Third Reading Passed (103-38) 33
Senate 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Referred Judicial Proceedings 33
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Favorable with Amendments {528971/1 Adopted 62A
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62A
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 63
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 House Concurs Senate Amendments 67
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Third Reading Passed (104-34) 67
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Criminal Law - Decriminalization of Attempted Suicide
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 571
Text - Chapter - Criminal Law - Decriminalization of Attempted Suicide
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-101.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM