Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Correctional Services - Inmates - Labor
Sponsored by
Delegates Wilkins, Acevero, Atterbeary, Barron, Charkoudian, Crutchfield, D.M. Davis, W. Fisher, Hill, Ivey, J. Lewis, Lopez, Mosby, and Shetty
Status
Veto sustained (0-138)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Commissioner of Correction to include in an annual report certain statistics on job classifications for inmate labor, certain daily wage scales, and the total number of inmates currently employed at certain facilities; and requiring the Division of Correction to include in a report regarding Maryland Correctional Enterprises certain similar statistics regarding inmate employment and wages.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0527
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0628 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2019
Legislative Date
1/17/2019
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2019
Legislative Date
1/17/2019
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Correctional Services - Inmates - Labor
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2019
Legislative Date
1/17/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2019
Legislative Date
1/17/2019
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/05/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
20
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Correctional Services - Inmates - Labor
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2019
Legislative Date
2/07/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (109-30)
Proceedings
22
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
22
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
59A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/24/2019
Legislative Date
5/24/2019
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
Veto sustained (0-138)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/17/2019 1/17/2019 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/17/2019 1/17/2019 Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Correctional Services - Inmates - Labor
House 1/17/2019 1/17/2019 Hearing canceled
House 1/17/2019 1/17/2019 Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 2/05/2019 2/05/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 20
Text - Third - Correctional Services - Inmates - Labor
House 2/07/2019 2/07/2019 Third Reading Passed (109-30) 22
Senate 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Referred Judicial Proceedings 22
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/01/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 58
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 59A
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Returned Passed 59
Post Passage 5/24/2019 5/24/2019 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Governor's Veto Letter
House 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 Veto sustained (0-138)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-207, 3-509 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM