Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Bay Restoration Fund - Authorized Uses
Sponsored by
Delegate C. Watson
Status
In the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the criteria for determining the use of funds in the Bay Restoration Fund for certain purposes in certain fiscal years to include climate resiliency and flood control; and specifying that certain grants to certain local governments may be used for stormwater management measures that include volume or quality control.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0172
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2020
Legislative Date
1/10/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Bay Restoration Fund - Authorized Uses
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2020
Legislative Date
1/13/2020
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/10/2020 1/10/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Bay Restoration Fund - Authorized Uses
House 1/13/2020 1/13/2020 Hearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/14/2020 2:01 PM