Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Crimes - Unattended Dogs in Extreme Weather Conditions
Sponsored by
Delegates Lehman, Bagnall, Bartlett, Belcastro, Chang, Crutchfield, Henson, Johnson, Krimm, McComas, Ruth, Solomon, Thiam, and K. Young
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from leaving a dog outside and unattended for longer than 30 minutes without access to continuous suitable shelter during extreme weather conditions, subject to certain exceptions; defining "extreme weather conditions" as temperatures below 32 degrees Fahrenheit or above 90 degrees or during an active weather warning; making a violation a civil offense; applying certain penalties ranging from a warning for a first violation to a fine of up to $1,000 for a third or subsequent offense; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0122
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0406 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
7/28/2020
Legislative Date
7/28/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/15 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Crimes - Unattended Dogs in Extreme Weather Conditions
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
10AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Crimes - Unattended Dogs in Extreme Weather Conditions
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/16/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (121-9)
Proceedings
12 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 7/28/2020 7/28/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/15 at 11:00 a.m.
Text - First - Crimes - Unattended Dogs in Extreme Weather Conditions
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 10AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Crimes - Unattended Dogs in Extreme Weather Conditions
House 2/16/2021 2/16/2021 Third Reading Passed (121-9) 12 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/17/2021 2/12/2021 Referred Judicial Proceedings 13 Click to view Recorded Media
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/22/2021 2:44 PM
Click to return on the top page