Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Property Tax Credit - Surviving Spouse of Veteran
Sponsored by
Delegates Wilkins, Charkoudian, Crutchfield, Hill, Moon, Saab, Valentino-Smith, Kipke, Pena-Melnyk, Malone, Adams, Shoemaker, Kaiser, Walker, D. Barnes, Boteler, Buckel, Cain, Palakovich Carr, Ebersole, Feldmark, Guyton, Hornberger, Ivey, Long, Luedtke, Mosby, Patterson, Reilly, Rose, Smith, Turner, and Washington
Status
Veto sustained (0-138)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering eligibility for a credit authorized against the county or municipal corporation property tax for the surviving spouses, who are at least 65 years of age, of certain veterans; providing that surviving spouses who are under the age of 65 and have not remarried may continue to receive the tax credit if the surviving spouses qualified for and received the tax credit before June 1, 2019; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2019.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0816
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2019
Legislative Date
1/17/2019
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Property Tax Credit - Surviving Spouse of Veteran
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2019
Legislative Date
1/18/2019
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2019
Legislative Date
2/12/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {235668/1 Adopted
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2019
Legislative Date
2/12/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Property Tax Credit - Surviving Spouse of Veteran
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2019
Legislative Date
2/15/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/24/2019
Legislative Date
5/24/2019
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
Veto sustained (0-138)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/17/2019 1/17/2019 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Property Tax Credit - Surviving Spouse of Veteran
House 1/18/2019 1/18/2019 Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Favorable with Amendments {235668/1 Adopted 25 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Property Tax Credit - Surviving Spouse of Veteran
House 2/15/2019 2/15/2019 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 Referred Budget and Taxation 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2019 3/29/2019 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/29/2019 3/25/2019 Favorable Adopted 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2019 3/25/2019 Second Reading Passed 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Returned Passed 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/24/2019 5/24/2019 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Governor's Veto Letter Click to view Recorded Media
House 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 Veto sustained (0-138)
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page