Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

HB0081


CH0045

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law – Sodomy – Repeal
Sponsored by
Delegates Moon, Bartlett, Charkoudian, Crutchfield, Korman, Lehman, J. LewisPalakovich Carr, Clippinger, Atterbeary, Cardin, Lopez, Shetty, Williams
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 45
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing the crime of sodomy; making conforming changes; clarifying that certain evidence is not admissible as an infamous crime; providing that a conviction before October 1, 2020, for sodomy may not be expunged under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0735
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2020
Legislative Date
1/13/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/14/2020
Legislative Date
1/14/2020
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {722811/1 Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2020
Legislative Date
2/20/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-5)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2020
Legislative Date
2/21/2020
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {908475/1 Adopted
Proceedings
52A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
52A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (124-4)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Criminal Law – Sodomy – Repeal
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 45
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/13/2020 1/13/2020 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Criminal Law - Sodomy and Unnatural or Perverted Sexual Practice - Repeal
House 1/14/2020 1/14/2020 Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Favorable with Amendments {722811/1 Adopted 30
House 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30
Text - Third - Criminal Law - Sodomy and Unnatural or Perverted Sexual Practice - Repeal
House 2/20/2020 2/20/2020 Third Reading Passed (133-5) 32
Senate 2/21/2020 2/21/2020 Referred Judicial Proceedings 33
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Favorable with Amendments {908475/1 Adopted 52A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 52A
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 53A
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 House Concurs Senate Amendments 53
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Third Reading Passed (124-4) 53
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Criminal Law – Sodomy – Repeal
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 45
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 5/11/2020 4:07 PM