Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public and Nonpublic Schools – Electric Retractable Room Partitions – Operation Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegate Queen
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 434
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting public and nonpublic school employees from operating an electric retractable room partition in a school except under certain circumstances; requiring any annual safety review, evaluation, or exercise for school employees in a certain school building to include certain information and demonstrations; requiring the State Department of Education to develop and disseminate model safety guidelines on the safe operation of electric retractable room partitions and publish the model safety guidelines on its public website; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0104
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/30/2020
Legislative Date
10/30/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {615360/1
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Kaiser) Adopted
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {615360/1 Adopted
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-0)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
4/01/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {794730/1 Adopted
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/12/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
39AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/30/2021
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/30/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/30/2021
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/30/2021
Legislative Date
5/30/2021
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 434
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/30/2020 10/30/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Public and Nonpublic Schools - Electric Retractable Room Partitions - Operation Requirements
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2021 3/19/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Favorable with Amendments {615360/1 28 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Kaiser) Adopted 28 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Favorable with Amendments {615360/1 Adopted 28 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public and Nonpublic Schools - Electric Retractable Room Partitions - Review and Report
House 3/22/2021 3/10/2021 Third Reading Passed (129-0) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2021 3/02/2021 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2021 4/01/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/01/2021 3/11/2021 Favorable with Amendments {794730/1 Adopted 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2021 3/11/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2021 3/12/2021 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 39AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/30/2021 House Concurs Senate Amendments 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/30/2021 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/30/2021 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Public and Nonpublic Schools - Electric Retractable Room Partitions - Review and Report
Post Passage 5/30/2021 5/30/2021 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 434
Text - Chapter - Public and Nonpublic Schools – Electric Retractable Room Partitions – Operation Requirements
(   7-447 )
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 12:01 PM
Click to return on the top page