Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Transportation - Maryland Metro/Transit Funding Act - Alterations
Sponsored by
Delegate Korman
Status
In the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Specifying that the Maryland Transit Administration must regularly consult with certain entities regarding the compilation and submission of the Central Maryland Regional Transit Plan; requiring the Maryland Transit Administration to submit a draft Central Maryland Regional Transit Plan to certain entities at least 45 days before the draft is finalized; altering the contents and elements of the Plan; requiring the Plan to be reviewed and updated every 6 years and to address a certain 30-year period; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0136
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1412 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2020
Legislative Date
1/13/2020
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/14/2020
Legislative Date
1/14/2020
Action
Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Transportation - Maryland Metro/Transit Funding Act - Alterations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2020
Legislative Date
1/17/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2020
Legislative Date
1/17/2020
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/13/2020 1/13/2020 First Reading Appropriations
House 1/14/2020 1/14/2020 Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Transportation - Maryland Metro/Transit Funding Act - Alterations
House 1/17/2020 1/17/2020 Hearing canceled
House 1/17/2020 1/17/2020 Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/24/2020 9:36 AM