Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance - Coverage for Elevated or Impaired Blood Glucose Levels, Prediabetes, and Obesity Treatment
Sponsored by
Delegate Barron
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 432
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing certain insurers, nonprofit health service plans, and health maintenance organizations to provide reimbursement for certain services of a dietitian or nutritionist under certain circumstances for the treatment of prediabetes and obesity; requiring certain insurers, nonprofit health service plans, and health maintenance organizations to provide coverage for certain equipment, supplies, training, and services for the treatment of elevated or impaired blood glucose levels induced by pregnancy or prediabetes; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0656
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2018
Legislative Date
1/12/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2018
Legislative Date
1/17/2018
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {976383/1 Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/06/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 432
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/12/2018 1/12/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Health Insurance - Coverage for Elevated or Impaired Blood Glucose Levels and Prediabetes Treatment
House 1/17/2018 1/17/2018 Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/26/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/27/2018 3/20/2018 Favorable with Amendments {976383/1 Adopted 54
House 3/27/2018 3/20/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 54
Text - Third - Health Insurance - Coverage for Elevated or Impaired Blood Glucose Levels, Prediabetes, and Obesity Treatment
House 3/28/2018 3/21/2018 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 55
Senate 3/29/2018 3/26/2018 Referred Rules 57
Senate 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 4/03/2018 4/03/2018 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/06/2018 4/06/2018 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 63
House 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Returned Passed 67
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 64
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 432
Text - Chapter - Health Insurance - Coverage for Elevated or Impaired Blood Glucose Levels, Prediabetes, and Obesity Treatment
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-706, 15-822 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM