Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Montgomery County Board of Education - Student Member - Voting MC 11-16
Sponsored by
Montgomery County Delegation
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 716
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the student member of the Montgomery County Board of Education to attend an executive session of the Board of Education that relates to a specified matter; and authorizing the student member of the Montgomery County Board of Education to vote on specified matters.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0086 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2016
Legislative Date
1/18/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2016
Legislative Date
1/20/2016
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2016
Legislative Date
2/22/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2016
Legislative Date
2/23/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2016
Legislative Date
2/23/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2016
Legislative Date
2/25/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-8)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2016
Legislative Date
2/26/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/29/2016
Legislative Date
2/29/2016
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Special Order until 3/29 (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (39-4)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/31/2016
Legislative Date
5/28/2016
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 716
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/18/2016 1/18/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/20/2016 1/20/2016 Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m.
House 2/22/2016 2/22/2016 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 2/23/2016 2/23/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 30
House 2/23/2016 2/23/2016 Second Reading Passed 30
House 2/25/2016 2/25/2016 Third Reading Passed (131-8) 32
Senate 2/26/2016 2/26/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 32
Senate 2/29/2016 2/29/2016 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/26/2016 3/28/2016 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/28/2016 3/24/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 53
Senate 3/28/2016 3/24/2016 Special Order until 3/29 (Senator Hershey) Adopted 53
Senate 3/29/2016 3/25/2016 Second Reading Passed 54
Senate 3/30/2016 3/26/2016 Third Reading Passed (39-4) 55
House 3/31/2016 3/26/2016 Returned Passed 58
Post Passage 5/31/2016 5/28/2016 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 716
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-901, 6-202 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM