Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Police Officers – Mental Health – Employee Assistance Programs
Sponsored by
Delegates Brooks, Bagnall, Cox, C. Jackson, and R. Lewis
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring each law enforcement agency to provide confidential access to an employee assistance program or a mental health program to address the mental health issues of police officers related to personal and work-related concerns including stress, financial issues, legal issues, and family problems; requiring each agency to provide all its officers with a voluntary mental health consultation or counseling following certain incidents; requiring an agency to provide access to these services at a minimal cost to the officer; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0074
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/16/2020
Legislative Date
10/16/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Police Officers – Mental Health – Employee Assistance Programs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/16/2020 10/16/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judiciary
House 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Police Officers – Mental Health – Employee Assistance Programs
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/29/2021 12:41 PM
Click to return on the top page