Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Correctional Services - Diminution Credits - Education
Sponsored by
Delegate Wilkins
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Awarding a diminution credit of 90 days per program completed to reduce the term of confinement of an inmate if the inmate successfully obtains a certain educational certificate, diploma, or degree; requiring the Commissioner of Correction to establish a uniform system of deductions and participation criteria; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0397
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/12/2020
Legislative Date
10/12/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 1/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Correctional Services - Diminution Credits - Education
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/12/2020 10/12/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judiciary
House 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 1/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Correctional Services - Diminution Credits - Education
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/29/2021 12:41 PM
Click to return on the top page