Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State and Local Housing Programs – Affirmatively Furthering Fair Housing
Sponsored by
Delegate Lierman
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Housing and Community Development to report to the General Assembly and the Governor by December 1 each year on the total of households receiving certain financial assistance disaggregated by race, disability status, and income; requiring the Department to administer its programs related to housing and community development to affirmatively further fair housing and prohibiting the Department from taking any action that is materially inconsistent with the duty to affirmatively further fair housing; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0687
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021, January 1, 2022
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/21/2020
Legislative Date
10/21/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 10/21/2020 10/21/2020 Pre-filed
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - State and Local Housing Programs – Affirmatively Furthering Fair Housing
(   2-302, 2-401, 2-402 )
Last Updated: 2/25/2021 11:53 AM
Click to return on the top page