Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Consumer Protection - Mobile Home Purchasers
Sponsored by
Delegates C. Jackson and D.E. Davis
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring, except under certain circumstances, certain lenders to serve on the borrower at least 30 days before a lender repossesses mobile home a written notice of the lender's intention to repossess a certain mobile home; providing that a mobile home retailer has a duty of good faith and fair dealing in providing financial information to a prospective consumer borrower; prohibiting a mobile home retailer from steering a prospective consumer borrower to certain financing products; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0155
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2020
Legislative Date
1/13/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Consumer Protection - Mobile Home Purchasers
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {733697/1 Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Consumer Protection - Mobile Home Purchasers
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2020
Legislative Date
2/20/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2020
Legislative Date
2/21/2020
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
33
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/13/2020 1/13/2020 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Consumer Protection - Mobile Home Purchasers
House 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Favorable with Amendments {733697/1 Adopted 30
House 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30
Text - Third - Consumer Protection - Mobile Home Purchasers
House 2/20/2020 2/20/2020 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 32
Senate 2/21/2020 2/21/2020 Referred Finance 33
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/21/2020 2:55 PM