Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Program - Requirements for Matching Funds
Sponsored by
Chair, Ways and Means Committee (By Request - Departmental - Commerce)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 258
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a nonprofit institution of higher education to deposit specified available institutional funds into the research endowment of the institution under specified circumstances to satisfy a specified 90-day deposit requirement to receive matching funds under the Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Program.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2017
Legislative Date
1/16/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2017
Legislative Date
1/17/2017
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 258
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/16/2017 1/16/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Program - Requirements for Matching Funds
House 1/17/2017 1/17/2017 Hearing 2/01 at 2:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/16/2017 3/13/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 47
Text - Third - Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Program - Requirements for Matching Funds
House 3/17/2017 3/14/2017 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 48
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Budget and Taxation 46A
Senate 3/24/2017 3/24/2017 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/04/2017 4/04/2017 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 Favorable Adopted 58
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 Second Reading Passed 58
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 59
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 258
Text - Chapter - Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Program - Requirements for Matching Funds
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-601, 6-613, 6-619 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM