Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - High School Graduation Requirements - Application
Sponsored by
Delegates Solomon and Rosenberg
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring public high school students, beginning in the 2022-2023 school year, as a requirement for graduation, to submit the Free Application for Federal Student Aid (FAFSA) to the U.S. Department of Education or the Maryland State Financial Aid Application (MSFAA) to the Maryland Higher Education Commission; authorizing a student or the parent or legal guardian of a minor student to submit to a county board of education a statement that the student understands the FAFSA or MSFAA and declines to complete and submit the application; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0762 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/30/2020
Legislative Date
10/30/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Education - High School Graduation Requirements - Application
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/30/2020 10/30/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Education - High School Graduation Requirements - Application
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:23 PM
Click to return on the top page