Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Dental Hygienists - Nitrous Oxide - Repeal of Termination Date
Sponsored by
Delegate Kipke
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 382
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the termination date of specified provisions of law relating to the authority of a dental hygienist to monitor a patient to whom nitrous oxide is administered.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/19/2013
Legislative Date
10/22/2013
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/19/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2014
Legislative Date
1/10/2014
Action
Hearing 1/23 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2014
Legislative Date
2/11/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2014
Legislative Date
2/13/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
27
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2014
Legislative Date
2/13/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
27
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2014
Legislative Date
2/18/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2014
Legislative Date
2/20/2014
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {254238/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/20/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Delegates Kipke, Oaks, and Pendergrass
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Senate Refuses to Recede
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Senators Montgomery, Dyson, and Reilly
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/05/2014
Legislative Date
5/05/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 382
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/19/2013 10/22/2013 Pre-filed
House 12/19/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 1/10/2014 1/10/2014 Hearing 1/23 at 2:00 p.m.
House 2/10/2014 2/11/2014 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/13/2014 2/13/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 27
House 2/13/2014 2/13/2014 Second Reading Passed 27
House 2/18/2014 2/18/2014 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 30
Senate 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 29
Senate 2/20/2014 2/20/2014 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/24/2014 3/26/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/26/2014 3/19/2014 Favorable with Amendments {254238/1 Report Adopted 53
Senate 3/26/2014 3/19/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 53
Senate 3/27/2014 3/20/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) 54
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments 63
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 House Requests Senate Recede 63
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Conference Committee Appointed 63
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Delegates Kipke, Oaks, and Pendergrass 63
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Senate Refuses to Recede 60
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Conference Committee Appointed 60
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Senators Montgomery, Dyson, and Reilly 60
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Conference Committee Report Adopted 68
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 68
Senate 4/07/2014 3/30/2014 Conference Committee Report Adopted 64
Senate 4/07/2014 3/30/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 64
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Passed Enrolled 64
Post Passage 5/05/2014 5/05/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 382
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-101, 4-205, 4-206.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM