Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Human Services - Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program - Heat and Eat Program and Study on Maryland Energy Assistance Program Eligibility
Sponsored by
Delegate Charkoudian
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Heat and Eat Program within the Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program in the Department of Human Services for the purpose of expanding food access to households that are receiving or eligible for Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program benefits; requiring the Department to study the feasibility of establishing automatic eligibility and approval for participation in the Maryland Energy Assistance Program for households receiving or eligible to receive certain benefits under State and federal law; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0913
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/16/2020
Legislative Date
10/16/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2021
Legislative Date
2/01/2021
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2021
Legislative Date
2/22/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {964660/1 Adopted
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2021
Legislative Date
2/25/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (117-21)
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/16/2021
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/16/2020 10/16/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Human Services – Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program – Heat and Eat Program
House 2/01/2021 2/01/2021 Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/22/2021 2/22/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 2/23/2021 2/23/2021 Favorable with Amendments {964660/1 Adopted 15 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/23/2021 2/23/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Human Services - Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program - Heat and Eat Program and Study on Maryland Energy Assistance Program Eligibility
House 2/25/2021 2/25/2021 Third Reading Passed (117-21) 16 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/26/2021 2/16/2021 Referred Finance 17 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 2/26/2021 3:08 PM
Click to return on the top page