Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System - Benefits
Sponsored by
Delegates Reilly and Cassilly
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the accrual rate to 2.5% for service earned on or after July 1, 2019, for calculating the retirement allowance for certain retirees of the Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System; and altering from 65% to 70% the maximum benefit that certain retirees of the Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System may receive.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2019
Legislative Date
1/18/2019
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System - Benefits
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2019
Legislative Date
1/23/2019
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/18/2019 1/18/2019 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System - Benefits
House 1/23/2019 1/23/2019 Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM