Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Occupations - Morticians and Funeral Directors - Apprenticeships
Sponsored by
Delegates Krebs, Pena-Melnyk, Bagnall, Barron, Bhandari, Carr, Charles, Chisholm, Cullison, Hill, Johnson, Kelly, Kerr, Kipke, R. Lewis, Reilly, Rosenberg, Sample-Hughes, Szeliga, and K. Young
Status
In the House - Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing the cap, from 2 to 4 years, that an applicant for a mortician or funeral director license may spend as an apprentice except under certain circumstances; requiring certain applicants and licensed apprentices to submit to the Maryland State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors a certain letter from the Director of the Mortuary Science program in which the applicant is enrolled; requiring the practical experience for an apprentice to include at least 1,000 hours in a funeral establishment under supervision; etc.
Committees
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0439
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2020
Legislative Date
1/13/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {546287/1 Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2020
Legislative Date
2/27/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
37
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/13/2020 1/13/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Health Occupations - Morticians and Funeral Directors - Apprenticeships
House 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Favorable with Amendments {546287/1 Adopted 35
House 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35
Text - Third - Health Occupations - Morticians and Funeral Directors - Apprenticeships
House 2/27/2020 2/27/2020 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 37
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/27/2020 2:40 PM