Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Montgomery County - Illegal Dumping and Litter Control Law - Adoption of Local Ordinance MC 11-15
Sponsored by
Montgomery County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 67
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the governing body of Montgomery County to adopt an ordinance to prohibit littering under the Illegal Dumping and Litter Control Law and to impose specified criminal and civil penalties.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2015
Legislative Date
1/23/2015
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2015
Legislative Date
1/29/2015
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/16/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/17/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/17/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2015
Legislative Date
2/19/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2015
Legislative Date
2/20/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2015
Legislative Date
3/04/2015
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2015
Legislative Date
3/26/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/24/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2015
Legislative Date
3/26/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2015
Legislative Date
4/14/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 67
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2015 1/23/2015 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 1/29/2015 1/29/2015 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/13/2015 2/16/2015 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 2/17/2015 2/17/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 25
House 2/17/2015 2/17/2015 Second Reading Passed 25
House 2/19/2015 2/19/2015 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 27
Senate 2/20/2015 2/20/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 27
Senate 3/04/2015 3/04/2015 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/26/2015 3/26/2015 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/26/2015 3/23/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 50
Senate 3/26/2015 3/23/2015 Second Reading Passed 50
Senate 3/27/2015 3/24/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 51
House 3/30/2015 3/26/2015 Returned Passed 56
Post Passage 4/14/2015 4/14/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 67
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-110 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM