Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Electric Vehicles and Recharging Equipment - Rebates and Tax Credits - Extension
Sponsored by
Delegates Fraser-Hidalgo, Lam, and Reznik
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Extending to fiscal year 2020 the Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment Rebate Program and authorization to issue motor vehicle excise tax credits for specified qualified plug-in electric drive vehicles; increasing a specified amount required to be transferred from the Strategic Energy Investment Fund to the Transportation Trust Fund; increasing, from $1,800,000 to $3,600,000 the total amount of motor vehicle excise tax credits that may be issued during a fiscal year; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2017
Legislative Date
1/16/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means and Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2017
Legislative Date
1/23/2017
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:30 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/16/2017 1/16/2017 First Reading Ways and Means and Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Electric Vehicles and Recharging Equipment - Rebates and Tax Credits - Extension
House 1/23/2017 1/23/2017 Hearing 2/07 at 1:30 p.m. (Ways and Means)
House 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing canceled
House 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
House 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/18/2017 3/18/2017 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-815 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM